LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB928
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB928
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB928
Compare Versions
SB928 Enrolled August 21, 2014
SB928 Amended August 4, 2014
SB928 Amended June 30, 2014
SB928 Amended June 17, 2014
SB928 Amended April 10, 2014
SB928 Introduced January 29, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB928 Enrolled August 21, 2014
SB928 Amended August 4, 2014
SB928 Amended June 30, 2014
SB928 Amended June 17, 2014
SB928 Amended April 10, 2014
SB928 Introduced January 29, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare