Assembly | 08/29/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 897.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |