Assembly | 06/25/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2014 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3688.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3705.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2014 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 2977.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2014 | Set for hearing March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |