Senate | 04/30/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3338.) | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |