Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3217.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2014 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |