|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 483, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 0. Page 4755.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6047.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3696.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3705.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3019.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|