LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB957
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB957
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB957
Action History
Senate
05/28/2014
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Senate
04/29/2014
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3310.)
Senate
03/25/2014
Set for hearing April 29.
Senate
02/20/2014
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Senate
02/07/2014
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
Senate
02/06/2014
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.