California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB959 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill March 17, 2014