09/26/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 356, Statutes of 2013. | |||
09/26/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 09/12/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2278.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/06/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 09/06/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2965.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 10.) (August 29). | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 898.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |