Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2014 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2927.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2014 | Set for hearing March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |