|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 748, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4937.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 6426.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3697.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3706.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2014
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2927.) (March 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2014
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|