LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB970
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB970
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB970
Action History
Senate
04/01/2014
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
03/26/2014
Hearing postponed by committee.
Senate
03/11/2014
Set for hearing April 8.
Senate
02/20/2014
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Senate
02/11/2014
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
Senate
02/10/2014
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.