Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3597.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3706.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3162.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2014
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|