|
09/30/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4940.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 6576.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2 and whereby amendments were adopted on August 22. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6460.) . Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6380.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 6335.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 3658.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3706.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3091.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2014
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|