07/18/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2014. | |||
07/18/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/09/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5809.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3321.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3217.) (April 22). | ||
Senate | 03/12/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |