LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB979
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB979
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB979
Action History
Senate
03/19/2014
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
Senate
03/17/2014
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
02/20/2014
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
02/12/2014
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
Senate
02/11/2014
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.