LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB980
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB980
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB980
Compare Versions
SB980 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB980 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB980 Amended August 19, 2014
SB980 Amended August 4, 2014
SB980 Amended June 19, 2014
SB980 Amended May 27, 2014
SB980 Amended May 7, 2014
SB980 Amended March 17, 2014
SB980 Introduced February 11, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB980 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB980 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB980 Amended August 19, 2014
SB980 Amended August 4, 2014
SB980 Amended June 19, 2014
SB980 Amended May 27, 2014
SB980 Amended May 7, 2014
SB980 Amended March 17, 2014
SB980 Introduced February 11, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare