LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB981
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB981
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB981
Action History
Senate
04/22/2014
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 5. Page 3212.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
04/10/2014
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Senate
03/06/2014
Set for hearing April 22.
Senate
02/20/2014
Referred to Com. on G.O.
Senate
02/12/2014
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
Senate
02/11/2014
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.