Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3217.) (April 22). | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |