Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3694.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3718.) (May 28). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3575.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2014
|
Set for hearing May 28 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3308.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|