Senate | 04/21/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3216.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |