Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3095.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |