Senate | 04/07/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |