Senate | 08/14/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2014 | Set for hearing April 14. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2014 | Set for hearing June 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 14). | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Set for hearing May 14. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |