Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3338.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3213.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and ED. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |