|
06/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2013-14 First Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 76.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. (Corrected June 19.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 138.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 129.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 131.) (Corrected June 17.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 30.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 23.) (March 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2013
|
Set for hearing March 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 20.) (February 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Set for hearing February 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|