Senate | 04/30/2013 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 758.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |