Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 6221.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Amendments by Senator Anderson tabled on motion of Senator Corbett. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3613.) Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 3613.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3717.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3484.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3387.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|