Senate | 08/29/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2013 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 2009.) (August 27). | ||
Senate | 08/20/2013 | Set for hearing August 27. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | Set for hearing July 9. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 937.) (May 15). | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS. | ||
Senate | 12/04/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. | ||
Senate | 12/03/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |