California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCA4 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/19/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SCA 4AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 19, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Liu  (   Coauthor:   Senator   Pavley   )   (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Bonilla   )  DECEMBER 3, 2012 A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 4 of Article XIII A thereof, and by amending Section 2 of Article XIII C thereof, relating to taxation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCA 4, as amended, Liu. Local government transportation projects: special taxes: voter approval. The California Constitution conditions the imposition of a special tax by a city, county, or special district upon the approval of 2/3 of the voters of the city, county, or special district voting on that tax, except that certain school entities may levy an ad valorem property tax for specified purposes with the approval of 55% of the voters within the jurisdiction of these entities. This measure would provide that the imposition, extension, or increase of a special tax by a local government for the purpose of providing funding for local transportation projects requires the approval of 55% of its voters voting on the proposition.  This measure would prohibit a   local government from expending any revenues derived from a special transportation tax approved by 55% of the voters at any time prior to the completion of a statutorily identified capital project funded by revenu   es derived from another special tax of the same local government that was approved by a   2/3   vote.  The measure would also make conforming and technical, nonsubstantive changes. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. Resolved by the Assembly, the Senate concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California at its  2011-12   2013-14  Regular Session commencing on the  sixth   third  day of December  2010   2012  , two-thirds of the membership of each house concurring, hereby proposes to the people of the State of California that the Constitution of the State be amended as follows: First-- That Section 4 of Article XIII A thereof is amended to read: Section 4. Except as otherwise provided by Section 2 of Article XIII C, a city, county, or special district, by a two-thirds vote of its voters voting on the proposition, may impose a special tax within that city, county, or special district, except an ad valorem tax on real property or a transactions tax or sales tax on the sale of real property within that city, county, or special district. Second-- That Section 2 of Article XIII C thereof is amended to read: SEC. 2. Notwithstanding any other provision of this Constitution: (a) A tax imposed by any local government is either a general tax or a special tax. A special district or agency, including a school district, has no authority to levy a general tax. (b) A local government shall not impose, extend, or increase any general tax unless and until that tax is submitted to the electorate and approved by a majority vote. A general tax is not deemed to have been increased if it is imposed at a rate not higher than the maximum rate so approved. The election required by this subdivision shall be consolidated with a regularly scheduled general election for members of the governing body of the local government, except in cases of emergency declared by a unanimous vote of the governing body. (c) Any general tax imposed, extended, or increased, without voter approval, by any local government on or after January 1, 1995, and prior to the effective date of this article, may continue to be imposed only if that general tax is approved by a majority vote of the voters voting in an election on the issue of the imposition, which election is held no later than November 6, 1998, and in compliance with subdivision (b). (d) (1) Except as otherwise provided in paragraph (2), a local government shall not impose, extend, or increase any special tax unless and until that tax is submitted to the electorate and approved by two-thirds of the voters voting on the proposition. A special tax is not deemed to have been increased if it is imposed at a rate not higher than the maximum rate so approved. (2) The imposition, extension, or increase of a special tax by a local government for the purpose of providing funding for local transportation projects under its jurisdiction, as may otherwise be authorized by law, requires the approval of 55 percent of the voters voting on the proposition. A special tax for the purpose of providing funding for local transportation projects is not deemed to have been increased if it is imposed at a rate not higher than the maximum rate previously approved in the manner required by law. The Legislature shall define local transportation projects for purposes of this paragraph.  (3) A local government shall not expend any revenues derived from a special tax approved by 55 percent of the voters under paragraph (2) at any time prior to the completion of a statutorily identified capital project funded, in whole or in part, by revenues derived from another special tax of the same local government that was approved by a two-thirds vote under paragraph (1).