Senate | 08/15/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2486.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 5). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 278.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |