Senate | 06/26/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4050.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5617.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 19). | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3268.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |