Senate | 08/07/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5849.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3535.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |