Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6303.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4142.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2014
|
Set for hearing June 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3846.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|