Senate | 08/07/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 103, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Page 5847.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 23). | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3360.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |