Senate | 08/20/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6046.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 7). | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4189.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |