Senate | 05/02/2013 | Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |