Senate | 06/16/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3926.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2014 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5495.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2014 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 5). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3593.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |