Senate | 08/28/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4720.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2014 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 6157.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12). | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3755.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |