Senate | 08/28/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6303.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 19). | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4142.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2014 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2014 | Set for hearing June 23. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3846.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2014 | Set for hearing June 10. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |