Senate | 07/01/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5706.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3928.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |