Senate | 08/28/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6423.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 21). | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4477.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2014 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |