Senate | 08/25/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6249.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 18). | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4297.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |