Senate | 08/25/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 126, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Page 6159.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 14). | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4291.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |