Senate | 09/05/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4992.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6716.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4363.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |