California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR135 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/05/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 135CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 149 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 5, 2014 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 29, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 29, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Evans JULY 3, 2014 Relative to National Massage Therapy Awareness Week in California. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 135, Evans. National Massage Therapy Awareness Week. This measure would proclaim the week of October 19, 2014, to October 25, 2014, inclusive, as National Massage Therapy Awareness Week in California. WHEREAS, Massage therapy is beneficial to overall health and is increasingly part of integrated health care; and WHEREAS, Consumers are spending in excess of $12 billion to $17 billion annually on massage therapy, and more insurance companies are covering it; and WHEREAS, Therapeutic massage can benefit people of all ages; and WHEREAS, A growing body of clinical research shows that massage therapy is beneficial for a wide variety of health issues, including stress, high blood pressure, fibromyalgia, arthritis, back pain, muscle injury and soreness, headaches, and maintaining good health; and WHEREAS, California regulates the massage therapy profession and massage therapists must meet the legal requirements to practice, which may include minimum hours of initial training and passing an examination in order to ensure patient safety; and WHEREAS, Massage therapists consistently provide consumer and professional education information on massage and help consumers and health professionals locate qualified massage therapists in their area; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the week of October 19, 2014, to October 25, 2014, inclusive, as National Massage Therapy Awareness Week in California; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.