Assembly | 08/27/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4902.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2014 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4485.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2014 | Set for hearing August 12. | ||
Senate | 08/05/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |