Senate | 09/05/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2014 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 6703.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6703.) Read. Adopted. (Page 6739.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2014 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 4407.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/05/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected August 12.) |