Senate | 05/08/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 776.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1158.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 411.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |