Senate | 07/03/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2246.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 309.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |